This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 16:11:46 (UTC).

JEFFREY CUI VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 JEFFREY CUI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0690

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUI JEFFREY

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

BAKER MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/12/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/12/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/12/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/12/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SONG-BEVERLY ACT GUIDE AND ADDENDUM

1/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SONG-BEVERLY ACT GUIDE AND ADDENDUM

Notice - SONG-BEVERLY ACT GUIDE AND ADDENDUM

1/24/2023: Notice - SONG-BEVERLY ACT GUIDE AND ADDENDUM

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/23/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

3/2/2023: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/17/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) to BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jeffrey Cui (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 01/17/2023; Service Cost: 73.94; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) to BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) to BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JEFFREY CUI (Plaintiff); As to: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christopher K. Lui in Department 76 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JEFFREY CUI (Plaintiff); As to: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JEFFREY CUI (Plaintiff); As to: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less