This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:50:32 (UTC).

JEFFREY C. TSAI, ET AL. VS JOANNE LIU

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 JEFFREY C TSAI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOANNE LIU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3197

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TSAI CHUNYEN C.

WONG HUA YEN CHEN

TSAI JEFFREY C.

Defendant

LIU JOANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HSU ROGER C.

Defendant Attorney

LI HONG

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

12/17/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joanne Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff); Chunyen C. Tsai (Plaintiff); Hua Yen Chen Wong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff); Chunyen C. Tsai (Plaintiff); Hua Yen Chen Wong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff); Chunyen C. Tsai (Plaintiff); Hua Yen Chen Wong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LI HONG