This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2019 at 08:37:18 (UTC).

JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP VS NEW YORK DREAM REGIONAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER MITCHELL LLP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against NEW YORK DREAM REGIONAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3472

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP

Respondent

NEW YORK DREAM REGIONAL CENTER FKA TRI STATE USA REGIONAL CENTER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SEDOR DANIEL PAUL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

8/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/22/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/13/2019: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEDOR DANIEL PAUL