Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 01:19:17 (UTC).

JEDIDIAH N. RUCKER; ET AL VS CHRISTOPHER BURIANI; ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 JEDIDIAH N RUCKER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER BURIANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2453

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUCKER JEDIDIAH N. AN INDIVIDUAL

GRANT JENNIFER J. AN INDIVIDUAL

GRANT JENNIFER

RUCKER JEDIDIAH

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BURIANI CYNTHIA AN INDIVIDUAL

BURIANI CHRISTOPHER AN INDIVIDUAL

D. REAMS AND COMPANY A BUSINESS ENTITY..

KEEL JODI AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

BURIANI CYNTHIA

D. REAMS AND COMPANY A BUSINESS ENTITY

BURIANI CHRISTOPHER

KEEL JODI

BURIANII CHRISTOPHER

ROES 1-100

DABID GERARD BEAMS DBA D REAMS AND COMPAN

JODI ANN KEEL

DAVID GERARD BEAMS DBA D REAMS AND COMPANY

KEEL JODI ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEPHEN B. GOLDBERG

GOLDBERG STEPHEN B.

Defendant Attorneys

DISMORE & SANDELMANN LLP

PETER T. HAVEN

HAVEN PETER THILO

SANDELMANN FRANK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/4/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES

5/9/2018: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/15/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Unknown

6/18/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY DEFENDANTS JODI KEEL AND DAVID REAMS D.B.A. DREAMS AND COMPANY

6/29/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY DEFENDANTS JODI KEEL AND DAVID REAMS D.B.A. DREAMS AND COMPANY

Minute Order

6/29/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/29/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Unknown

6/29/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

1/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Jedidiah Rucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Christopher Buriani (Defendant); Cynthia Buriani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Jedidiah Rucker (Plaintiff); Jennifer Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY DEFENDANTS JODI KEEL AND DAVID REAMS D.B.A. DREAMS AND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (PTY BEING SERVED: CHRISTOPHER BURIANI RECIPIENT: LEWIS STEVENSON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jedidiah Rucker (Plaintiff); Jennifer Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (PTY BEING SERVED: CYNTHIA BURIANI RECIPIENT: LEWI STEVENSON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jedidiah Rucker (Plaintiff); Jennifer Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jedidiah Rucker (Plaintiff); Jennifer Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Jedidiah Rucker (Plaintiff); Jennifer Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDBERG STEPHEN B