This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2023 at 12:25:30 (UTC).

JEANNINE URBAN, VS BRISTOL FARMS

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 JEANNINE URBAN, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BRISTOL FARMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8760

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

URBAN JEANNINE

Appellant and Defendant

BRISTOL FARMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OZZELLO MARK A.

STOBART JOHN ELY

HAKIMI HELGA

Defendant Attorneys

TALLEY KIMBERLY M.

GURNICK MATTHEW D.

KATZ STEVEN BERNARD

MUSOLINO REGINA ANNE

 

Court Documents

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

5/17/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Complaint

9/2/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/31/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATEMENT RE: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

8/22/2023: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATEMENT RE: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED NOA 6/16/23

7/26/2023: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED NOA 6/16/23

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPEAL - NTC DESIGNATING RECORD OF APPEAL APP-003/010/103 RESPONDENT

7/3/2023: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPEAL - NTC DESIGNATING RECORD OF APPEAL APP-003/010/103 RESPONDENT

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

6/26/2023: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

6/22/2023: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE

6/16/2023: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE

6/16/2023: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS RE: MAY 22, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

5/22/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS RE: MAY 22, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/2/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order - ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/2/2023: Order - ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Ruling

5/2/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

5/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Reply - DEFENDANT BRISTOL FARMS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/25/2023: Reply - DEFENDANT BRISTOL FARMS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2024
  • Hearing08/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Appeal scheduled for 08/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 08/31/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketJoint Statement re: Further Status Conference; Filed by: Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA 6/16/23; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA 6/16/23 Reporter's Fee: Name Extension changed from NOA 6/16/23 to NOA 6/16/23 Reporter's Fee ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 Respondent; Filed by: Jeannine Urban, (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Jeannine Urban, (Plaintiff); As to: Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeannine Urban, (Plaintiff); As to: Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jeannine Urban, (Plaintiff); As to: Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeannine Urban, (Plaintiff); As to: Bristol Farms (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less