This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2021 at 10:49:20 (UTC).

JEANNIE CHOI VS VICKIE JIN KIM, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 JEANNIE CHOI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against VICKIE JIN KIM, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9349

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CHOI JEANNIE AKA JEANNIE KIM AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HAN AN INDIVIDUAL HE SOOK

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL IN KYUM

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL VICKIE JIN

HAN AN INDIVIDUAL KI

TIAA BANK A FLORIDA CORPORATION

HAN AN INDIVIDUAL CAROLINE

KIM IN KYUM

KIM VICKIE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HAN AN INDIVIDUAL KI

CHOI JEANNIE AKA JEANNIE KIM AN INDIVIDUAL

HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLC

HAN KI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

PARK DALE J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SHILUB MICHAEL J.

HAN EMMANUEL

MYERS DAVID ALLEN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HAN EMMANUEL

PARK DALE J

MYUNG S. CALVIN

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT VICKIE KIM TO HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLCS MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING VICKIE KIM TO FURNISH A BOND; DECLARATIONS OF VICKIE KIM AND MICHAEL J. SHILUB AND EXHIBITS THE

1/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT VICKIE KIM TO HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLCS MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING VICKIE KIM TO FURNISH A BOND; DECLARATIONS OF VICKIE KIM AND MICHAEL J. SHILUB AND EXHIBITS THE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply - REPLY NOMINAL CROSS-DEFENDANT HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLC'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FURNISH A BOND

1/15/2021: Reply - REPLY NOMINAL CROSS-DEFENDANT HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLC'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FURNISH A BOND

Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF VICKIE KIM AND MICHAEL J. SHILUB, FILED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FURNISH A BOND

1/15/2021: Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF VICKIE KIM AND MICHAEL J. SHILUB, FILED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FURNISH A BOND

Answer

9/29/2020: Answer

Answer

10/5/2020: Answer

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING CROSSCOMPLAINANT VICKIE KIM TO FURNISH A BOND; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/15/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING CROSSCOMPLAINANT VICKIE KIM TO FURNISH A BOND; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Answer

10/15/2020: Answer

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/17/2020: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/14/2020

8/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/14/2020

Case Management Order

7/15/2020: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANT TIAA BANK

7/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANT TIAA BANK

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/3/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketObjection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF VICKIE KIM AND MICHAEL J. SHILUB, FILED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FURNISH A BOND); Filed by HK Carson Properties LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketReply (NOMINAL CROSS-DEFENDANT HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLC'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FURNISH A BOND); Filed by HK Carson Properties LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vickie Jin Kim, an individual (Defendant); In Kyum Kim, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketOpposition (OF DEFENDANT VICKIE KIM TO HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLC?S MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING VICKIE KIM TO FURNISH A BOND; DECLARATIONS OF VICKIE KIM AND MICHAEL J. SHILUB AND EXHIBITS THERETO); Filed by Vickie Jin Kim, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (REQUIRING CROSSCOMPLAINANT VICKIE KIM TO FURNISH A BOND; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF -[Res ID: 3045]); Filed by HK Carson Properties LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to First Amended Cross-Complaint by Nominal Cross-Defendant HK Carson Properties LLC); Filed by HK Carson Properties LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to First Amended Cross-Complaint by Jeannie Choi); Filed by Jeannie Choi (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Amended Cross-Complaint (by Cross-Defendants, Ki Han, He Sook Han and Caroline Han)); Filed by Ki Han (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint (1st)); Filed by In Kyum Kim (Cross-Complainant); Vickie Kim (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by In Kyum Kim, an individual (Cross-Complainant); Vickie Jin Kim, an individual (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ki Han, an individual (Defendant); He Sook Han, an individual (Defendant); Caroline Han, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Vickie Jin Kim, an individual (Defendant); In Kyum Kim, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jeannie Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jeannie Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jeannie Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeannie Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeannie Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeannie Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIAA BANK A FLORIDA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HK CARSON PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAN EMMANUEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYUNG S. CALVIN