This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 02:40:58 (UTC).

JEANNENE PINKS VS PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. FRANCIS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 JEANNENE PINKS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST FRANCIS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7854

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINKS JEANNENE

Defendant

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. FRANCIS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HILAIRE MIKA M.

APPELL BARRY M

SHAPIRO SCOTT E.

Defendant Attorneys

SIMS ALAN

PATAJO EMILY T.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

9/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/28/2021

9/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/28/2021

Notice of Settlement

9/28/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE DOMINGUEZ, #12523

4/29/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE DOMINGUEZ, #12523

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBI...) OF 04/29/2021

4/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBI...) OF 04/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBI...)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBI...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTIE BRACE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES-ST. FRANCIS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTIE BRACE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES-ST. FRANCIS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/22/2021: Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Request for Judicial Notice

4/22/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/22/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY REPLY

4/26/2021: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY REPLY

Case Management Statement

4/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JEANNENE PINKS AND BARRY M. APPELL

4/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JEANNENE PINKS AND BARRY M. APPELL

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

4/16/2021: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Motion to Compel Arbitration

3/15/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request for Judicial Notice

3/15/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jeannene Pinks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docketat 12:10 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of 09/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jeannene Pinks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Prime Healthcare Services - St. Francis, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Prime Healthcare Services - St. Francis, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Prime Healthcare Services - St. Francis, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jeannene Pinks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeannene Pinks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeannene Pinks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeannene Pinks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. FRANCIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMS ALAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATAJO EMILY