This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 22:34:34 (UTC).

JEANINNE M. VALLEJO, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS BULLET EXPRESS LINE INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 JEANINNE M VALLEJO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BULLET EXPRESS LINE INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2435

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ AN INDIVIDUAL OMAR VERA

VALLEJO AN INDIVIDUAL JEANINNE M.

Defendants

BULLET EXPRESS LINE INC.

SCOUT FREIGHT COMPANY INC.

SINGH AN INDIVIDUAL DALJEET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISON OWILI K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/29/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2024
  • Hearing08/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeaninne M. Vallejo, an individual (Plaintiff); Omar Vera Gonzalez, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeaninne M. Vallejo, an individual (Plaintiff); Omar Vera Gonzalez, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeaninne M. Vallejo, an individual (Plaintiff); Omar Vera Gonzalez, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eison, Owili K