This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 11:05:05 (UTC).

JEANETTE SOLIS VS STARLIGHT CINEMAS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 JEANETTE SOLIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STARLIGHT CINEMAS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0369

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLIS JEANETTE

Defendants

STARLIGHT CINEMAS INC.

AKARAKIAN THEATRES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY KEITH N

Defendant Attorney

ALMODOVAR JACQUELINE MARIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/10/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

8/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/2/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/3/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Starlight Cinemas, Inc. (Defendant); Akarakian Theatres, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Starlight Cinemas, Inc. (Defendant); Akarakian Theatres, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Starlight Cinemas, Inc. (Defendant); Akarakian Theatres, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jeanette Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeanette Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeanette Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeanette Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARLIGHT CINEMAS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AKARAKIAN THEATRES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALEY KEITH N.