This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 13:47:16 (UTC).

JEAN YUNA HORIHATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS LUIS GAYTAN HERNANDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 JEAN YUNA HORIHATA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS GAYTAN HERNANDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6129

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HORIHATA AN INDIVIDUAL JEAN YUNA

RAPPAPORT AN INDIVIDUAL MARK

Defendant

HERNANDEZ AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS GAYTAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH ESQ BRIAN J

Defendant Attorney

PASAROW STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

9/13/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

7/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/19/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2024
  • Hearing07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Hearing12/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LUIS GAYTAN HERNANDEZ, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LUIS GAYTAN HERNANDEZ, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by LUIS GAYTAN HERNANDEZ, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JEAN YUNA HORIHATA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JEAN YUNA HORIHATA, an individual (Plaintiff); MARK RAPPAPORT, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JEAN YUNA HORIHATA, an individual (Plaintiff); MARK RAPPAPORT, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JEAN YUNA HORIHATA, an individual (Plaintiff); MARK RAPPAPORT, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH