This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 02:39:00 (UTC).

JEAN SHIR VS SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 JEAN SHIR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5532

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIR JEAN

Defendants

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSEN GLENN T.

ROSEN GLENN TODD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jean Shir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jean Shir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jean Shir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jean Shir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN GLENN T.