This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 15:34:40 (UTC).

JEAN CLAUDE RAHIER VS JAIME VALADEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 JEAN CLAUDE RAHIER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAIME VALADEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN C. YEP and STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0163

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN C. YEP

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAHIER JEAN CLAUDE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF LANCASTER A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIY

VALADEZ JAIME

VENCO WESTERN INC.

RHA LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS-PLANNERS INC.

VENCO WESTERN

PBKWLC ARCHITECTS

DESIGN ENGINEERING GROUP

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VALADEZ JAIME

VENCO WESTERN INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK TAYLOR LORRAINE AMY

JOHNSON WILL L.

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RAMSEY CHRISTOPHER

REINHOLTZ JACK R

JOHNSON MATTHEW

NETTELS CHARLES F.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER ...)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER ...)

Order - Dismissal

8/31/2021: Order - Dismissal

Case Management Statement

8/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

8/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

8/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

6/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

6/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

5/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Cross-Complaint

5/5/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/5/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Amended Complaint

3/23/2021: Amended Complaint

Answer

3/26/2021: Answer

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • Hearing07/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions Including Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Further Status Conference; Order ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by JEAN CLAUDE RAHIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CITY OF LANCASTER, a Governmental Entitiy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by CITY OF LANCASTER, a Governmental Entitiy (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JEAN CLAUDE RAHIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF LANCASTER, a Governmental Entitiy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JEAN CLAUDE RAHIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JEAN CLAUDE RAHIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JEAN CLAUDE RAHIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RHA LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS-PLANNERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VENCO WESTERN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LANCASTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NETTELS CHARLES F. ESQ.