This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2022 at 04:15:27 (UTC).

JD AQUINO CORPORATION, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 JD AQUINO CORPORATION, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5008

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AQUINO DAMARIS

AQUINO JOSE

BAGHERABADI MOHAMMAD

BAGHERABADI PARHAM

CAPEWELL DALE

CLARIN ELIZABETH CARINHAY

GUDEGAST TATIANA

JD AQUINO CORPORATION

KRAFT JEFF

SEAMAN ELIZABETH

SEAMAN ROY

VINCE ROBERT

VINCE STACEY

WOMACK GEORGE WILLIAM

WOMACK SALLY JEAN

WOOD DAVID

WOOD TAMMY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CURTIS ROBERT

ROBERTSON ALEXANDER

SPRETER GEOFFREY JOSEPH

LIEBMAN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON JOHN C.

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/10/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (DALE CAPEWELL JR.)

7/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (DALE CAPEWELL JR.)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JOSIE AQUINO)

7/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JOSIE AQUINO)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

Request for Dismissal

8/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

7/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/27/2022

5/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/27/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

5/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/31/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal without Prejudice: Name Extension: without Prejudice; As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Jose Aquino (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Jose Aquino [GAL to Josie Aquino] (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Aquino to Aquino [GAL to Josie Aquino]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Jose Aquino [DISMISSED] (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Aquino [GAL to Josie Aquino] to Aquino [DISMISSED]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Josie Aquino [DISMISSED] (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Aquino to Aquino [DISMISSED]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute [21SMCV01768]; F...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JD Aquino Corporation, et al. on 05/04/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jose Aquino [GAL to Josie Aquino] and Josie Aquino as to Southern California Edison Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jose Aquino (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); JCCP Number: JCCP5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JD Aquino Corporation (Plaintiff); Jose Aquino, (Plaintiff); Jose Aquino (Plaintiff); Damaris Aquino, (Plaintiff); JD Aquino (Plaintiff); Dale Capewell (Plaintiff); Dale Capewell, Jr. (Plaintiff); Jeff Kraft, (Plaintiff); David Wood (Plaintiff); Tammy Wood, (Plaintiff); George William Womack, (Plaintiff); Sally Jean Womack, (Plaintiff); Mohammad Bagherabadi, (Plaintiff); Parham Bagherabadi, (Plaintiff); Robert Vince, (Plaintiff); Stacey Vince, (Plaintiff); Tatiana Gudegast, (Plaintiff); Roy Seaman, (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Seaman, (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Carinhay Clarin, (Plaintiff); Josie Aquino (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JD Aquino Corporation (Plaintiff); Jose Aquino, (Plaintiff); Jose Aquino (Plaintiff); Damaris Aquino, (Plaintiff); JD Aquino (Plaintiff); Dale Capewell (Plaintiff); Dale Capewell, Jr. (Plaintiff); Jeff Kraft, (Plaintiff); David Wood (Plaintiff); Tammy Wood, (Plaintiff); George William Womack, (Plaintiff); Sally Jean Womack, (Plaintiff); Mohammad Bagherabadi, (Plaintiff); Parham Bagherabadi, (Plaintiff); Robert Vince, (Plaintiff); Stacey Vince, (Plaintiff); Tatiana Gudegast, (Plaintiff); Roy Seaman, (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Seaman, (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Carinhay Clarin, (Plaintiff); Josie Aquino (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Josie Aquino): Status Date changed from 07/07/2022 to 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Dale Capewell Jr.): Status Date changed from 07/07/2022 to 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLIGOR CRAIG ALEXANDER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON JOHN CHARLES