This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 01:19:48 (UTC).

JAZMINN WALKER VS GARDENA HOSPITAL, L.P.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 JAZMINN WALKER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GARDENA HOSPITAL, L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0371

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER JAZMINN

Defendant

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRAY BRUCE T. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SPENCER DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2021

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING BY PLAINTIFF

3/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING BY PLAINTIFF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2021

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2021

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

1/19/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAZMINN J. WALKER RE. OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

1/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAZMINN J. WALKER RE. OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

1/21/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

1/21/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

Reply - REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

1/26/2021: Reply - REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

1/26/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/29/2021: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAZMINN J. WALKER RE. OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

1/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAZMINN J. WALKER RE. OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL AN UNDERTAKING

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/29/2021: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • Hearing05/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel an Undertaking by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Hearing05/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Hearing05/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Complaint;) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (an Undertaking by Plaintiff) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 12:26 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (an Undertaking by Plaintiff) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jazminn Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jazminn Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jazminn Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jazminn Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jazminn Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jazminn Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jazminn Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURRAY BRUCE T.