This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 03:22:19 (UTC).

JAZMINE WANZO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS MICHAEL GILBERT NUNN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 JAZMINE WANZO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL GILBERT NUNN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1380

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANZO AN INDIVIDUAL JAZMINE

Defendants

DONLEN TRUST LSR. A BUSINESS ENTITY

NUNN AN INDIVIDUAL MICHAEL GILBERT

RAISER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RALSER-CA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UBER USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARRAF RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

ANDREWS ALYSSA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE) OF 04/05/2022

4/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE) OF 04/05/2022

Answer

3/24/2022: Answer

Answer

3/24/2022: Answer

Answer

3/24/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/12/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/12/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/12/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/12/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2025
  • Hearing01/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • Hearing06/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 07:44 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Related Case) of 04/05/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RAlSER-CA LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RAISER LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JAZMINE WANZO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAZMINE WANZO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAZMINE WANZO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JAZMINE WANZO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DONLEN TRUST LSR is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant