Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 01:12:56 (UTC).

JAZMIN SOLORIO VS GUILLERMINA RAMIREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 JAZMIN SOLORIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUILLERMINA RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5871

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLORIO JAZMIN

Defendants

MORENO GLORIA RAMIREZ

RAMIREZ GUILLERMINA

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

3/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/16/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jazmin Solorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jazmin Solorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less