This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 05:37:24 (UTC).

JAYNE SHIM VS DUAN KWON ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 JAYNE SHIM filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DUAN KWON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4738

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIM JAYNE AS TRUSTEE OF THE SHIM FAMILY

Defendants and Respondents

GEM HEALING CENTER

CHO SUNG S.

KWON DUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FLOYD HARRY E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

5/25/2018: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

6/5/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

8/6/2018: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

JUDGMENT

5/21/2018: JUDGMENT

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/30/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

4/30/2018: PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

4/30/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

4/30/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

PROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

3/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

PROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

3/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

3/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/14/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

3/26/2018: REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Minute Order

4/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL

ANSWER?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

3/2/2018: ANSWER?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketRETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Shim, jayne as trustee of the Shim Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketWrit issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketAppl for Writ of Execution & Ord; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketANSWER UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketANSWER UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Duan Kwon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shim, jayne as trustee of the Shim Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Attorney or Party without Attorney: For Court Use Only Law Offices Of: MELLER & FLOYD

47854 " MAR 14 2018

, Larier, Execulivé 0

Attorney for: Plaintiff Insert name of Court, and Judicial District and Branch Court:

Los Angeles County Superior Court-Central ‘ Plaintiff- SHIM

Defendant: KWON '

PROOF OF SERVICE Hearing Date: Time: Dept/Div: Case Number: I

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BC694738

1. At the time of service I was at least 18 yearsparty to this action.

TIME OF THE FILING OF THE ACTION

b. Person served.: JANE DOE-, Asian, Female, 40 Years Old, Black Hair, Brown Eyes, 5 Feet 5

Inches, 140 Pounds

4. Address where the party was served.: 2320 W. OLYMPIC BLVD,, #200 LOS ANGELES, CA 90006 5. Iserved the party: d. by other means On: Mon., Feb. 26, 2018 at: 4:29PM By Posting and First Class Mail in Accordance with CCP 415.46, and by leaving the copies with or in the Presence of: JANE DOE-, Asian, Female, 40 Years Old, Black Hair, Brown Eyes, 5 Feet 5 Inches, 140 Pounds (1) (Business) By posting & mailing | (4) I thereafter mailed (by first-class, postage prepaid) copies of the documents to the person to be served at the place where the copies were left (Code Civ. Proc., 415.20). I mailed the document on: Mon., Feb. 26, 2018 from: LOS ANGELES, CA

6. The "Notice to the Person Served" (on the Summons) was completed as follows: on behalf of: ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES AT THE TIME OF THE FILING OF THE Other: ACTION CCP 415.46 - OCCUPANT

7. Person Who Served Papers: Recoverable Cost Per CCP 1033.5(a)(4)(B) a. ARTURO RUIZ d. The Fee for Service was: J .1 y Countrvw1deProces s e. Iam: (3) registered California process server

(i) Independent Contractor

A Legai Support Service LLC COUNTRYWIDE PROCESS, LLC REGISTRATION #7159

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLER & FLOYD - HARRY E. FLOYD ESQ