This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:56:45 (UTC).

JAYDI J SERBELLON DE REYES VS CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC ET

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 JAYDI J SERBELLON DE REYES filed an Other lawsuit against CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9199

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DE REYES JAYDI J. SERBELLON

SERBELLON DE REYES JAYDI J.

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF

CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FOLEY DENISE V. ESQ.

FOLEY DENISE V.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

SOSA CARLOS E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/26/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/18/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

5/23/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/19/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/3/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

7/24/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

8/28/2018: Unknown

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/28/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/29/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF DENISE V. FOLEY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/29/2018: DECLARATION OF DENISE V. FOLEY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

8/29/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

AMENDED NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVTL

9/14/2018: AMENDED NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVTL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/14/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

9/24/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal with Regard to the Default Package) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal with Regard to the Default ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketRuling: Motion to Set Aside Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff Jaydi J. Serbellon De Reyes' Motion to S...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by Jaydi J. Serbellon De Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Request Entry of Default) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Request...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Request...) of 01/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Jaydi J. Serbellon De Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-07-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jaydi J. Serbellon De Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jaydi J. Serbellon De Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT -EQUITABLE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9199    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 48

Hearing Date: OSC Date of January 9, 2020

Defaulting D(s): Century One Auto Center, Inc.

Total: A CIV-100 Form requesting entry of default judgment was not submitted after default was entered as to the 1AC on November 21, 2019.

DENY without prejudice.

FACTS:

Plaintiff purchased a used car from Defendant, but all warning dash lights came on, and the dealer still has the vehicle in its possession. Also, Defendant failed to provide a Certificate of Title to Plaintiff, and failed to register the vehicle despite collecting fees for doing so.

ANALYSIS:

[X] Default Entered on: November 21, 2019

[NO] Date of Service of Complaint:

[ ] Personal:

[ ] Substituted (left with family/household members & copies mailed):

[ ] Publication

[ ] Proof of Publication

[X] Mail and Acknowledgement of Receipt: A copy of the completed Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt was not attached to the proof of service filed on August 21, 2019.

[X] Summary of Case

[NO] Relief Prayed for in Complaint is the same as in default prove up: Need New CIV-100 Form

In Complaint? In Default?

Compensatory: $Need new CIV-100 Form $Need new CIV-100 Form

Late Fees: $ $

Medicals: $ $

Punitives: $ $

Lost Wages: $ $

Interest: $ $

Costs: $ $

Attorneys Fees: $ $

Other:

(all relief afforded in default judgment is limited to type and amount pleaded in complaint, except for punitives in PI/Death cases. CCP 425.11, 580, 585(a),(b).)

[NO] Atty’s Fees: Must be based on fee schedule; need new CIV-100 Form

[ ] Authorized by statute: [ ] or by contract:

[ ] Amount requested: $

Amount over schedule (L.R. 3.214): $

[ ] Statement of Extraordinary services? (LR 3.214(d))

[NO] Interest Computations: Need new CIV-100 Form

Principal: $

Start Date: End Date:

Rate: Annual: Per Diem: $

[ ] Memorandum of costs: $

[NO] Declaration of Non-Military Status (executed within 6 months): Need new CIV-100 Form

[X] Yes [ ] No [ ] Date:

[X] Request for Dismissal of All Does:

[X] With Prejudice [ ] Without Prejudice

[X] Exhibits – Not a promissory note

[ ] Judgment Included (Conform with L.R. 3.0; 8.96):

[X] Other:

A new CIV-100 Form requesting entry of default judgment, and amounts sought, must be submitted, along with supporting evidence, following entry of default as to the 1AC.

TENTATIVE:

[X] DENY W/OUT PREJUDICE: See “Other” above.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOLEY DENISE V. ESQ.