This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2020 at 02:56:08 (UTC).

JAYDEN OROZCO VS LA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 JAYDEN OROZCO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6389

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

ZETH ENGINEERING INC

DANNY LETNER INC

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS CORP

LETNER ROOFING CO

LA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

EVERLAST BUILDERS INC

DOES 1 TO 50

ASBESTOS INSTANT RESPONSE INC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

Guardian Ad Litem and Not Classified By Court

ORAOZCO FELICIANO

Minor

OROZCO JAYDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

QUIGLEY LANE ESQ.

QUIGLEY LANE E. ESQ.

DONOHUE ROBERT

GALLAGHER MICHAEL E.

Minor Attorney

PUCHE SERGIO J. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

FIORE MAURO J. JR.

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

10/7/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)

10/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/22/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Notice - NOTICE NTC OF ANNUITY FUNDING

4/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE NTC OF ANNUITY FUNDING

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT DANNY LETNER, INC. DBA LETNER ROOFING CO.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT DANNY LETNER, INC. DBA LETNER ROOFING CO.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

12/5/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/05/2019

12/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/05/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF TRIAL COUNSEL

11/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Proof of Personal Service

9/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

8/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/6/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

3/13/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

SUMMONS -

3/19/2018: SUMMONS -

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Conditional-Need Minor's Compromise)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (and Proof of Funding Annuity) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (and Proof of Funding Annuity) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by LA Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Conditional-Need Minor's Compromise)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Conditional Settlement ) (Has Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim been filed and granted?)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jayden Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, STATUTORY LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696389    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAYDEN OROZCO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DIST., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC696389

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITIONER’S PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 2, 2020

Plaintiff, Jayden Orozco, a minor by and through his GAL, Feliciano Orozco, filed this action against Defendants, LAUSD, et al. for damages arising out of an accident that occurred in a construction area adjacent to LAUSD’s playground. Plaintiff suffered a concussion and related injuries as a result of the accident, but his complaints have resolved completely at this time.

Plaintiff, by and through his GAL and attorney, has agreed to settle this action with LAUSD for the total amount of $75,000. If approved, $18,750 will be used for attorneys’ fees, $4612 for medical expenses, and $6813.05 for costs of suit. Petitioner proposes to use the balance of $44,824.95 to purchase a single premium deferred annuity.

The Court has reviewed the settlement and finds it is fair and reasonable. The Court also finds the attorneys’ fees fair and reasonable, in that they amount to 25% of the total settlement.

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Plaintiff must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. Plaintiff is nine years old, and was only six at the time of the accident; the Court therefore finds good cause to excuse him from appearance and testimony. If the Court is satisfied with Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, the petition will be granted.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Dated this 2nd day of March, 2020

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC696389    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAYDEN OROZCO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DIST., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC696389

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITIONER’S PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 2, 2020

Plaintiff, Jayden Orozco, a minor by and through his GAL, Feliciano Orozco, filed this action against Defendants, LAUSD, et al. for damages arising out of an accident that occurred in a construction area adjacent to LAUSD’s playground.  Plaintiff suffered a concussion and related injuries as a result of the accident, but his complaints have resolved completely at this time. 

Plaintiff, by and through his GAL and attorney, has agreed to settle this action with LAUSD for the total amount of $75,000.  If approved, $18,750 will be used for attorneys’ fees, $4612 for medical expenses, and $6813.05 for costs of suit.  Petitioner proposes to use the balance of $44,824.95 to purchase a single premium deferred annuity.

The Court has reviewed the settlement and finds it is fair and reasonable.  The Court also finds the attorneys’ fees fair and reasonable, in that they amount to 25% of the total settlement. 

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Plaintiff must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance.  Plaintiff is nine years old, and was only six at the time of the accident; the Court therefore finds good cause to excuse him from appearance and testimony.  If the Court is satisfied with Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, the petition will be granted.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Dated this 2nd day of March, 2020

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court