This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 11:22:05 (UTC).

JAY MELDMAN VS TANK TOP DOG LLC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 JAY MELDMAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TANK TOP DOG LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9957

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MELDMAN JAY

JKM CONSULTING CORP. A TEXAS CORPORATION

JKM MARKETING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

TANK TOP DOG LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FINK KEITH A.

Cross Defendant Attorney

DANIELS DARREN D

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/3/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/18/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

11/14/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

11/14/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/14/2022: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

11/14/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/31/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demand for Jury Trial

10/31/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/18/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/18/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

9/28/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/28/2022: Cross-Complaint

Order - RULING RE: DEFENDANT TANK TOP DOG LLC'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Order - RULING RE: DEFENDANT TANK TOP DOG LLC'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEM...)

8/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEM...)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT TANK TOP DOG LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/22/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT TANK TOP DOG LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/17/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jay Meldman on 03/22/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jay Meldman, causes 7th Cause of Action (PAGA) ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jay Meldman (Plaintiff); As to: Jay Meldman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/04/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 04/04/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/31/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: JKM Consulting Corp. a Texas Corporation (Cross-Defendant); JKM Marketing LLC, a California limited liability company (Cross-Defendant); Jay Meldman (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAddress for Darren D Daniels (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jay Meldman (Plaintiff); As to: Tank Top Dog LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jay Meldman (Plaintiff); As to: Tank Top Dog LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jay Meldman (Plaintiff); As to: Tank Top Dog LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******9957 Hearing Date: August 29, 2022 Dept: 61

I. DEMURRER

A demurrer should be sustained only where the defects appear on the face of the pleading or are judicially noticed. (Code Civ. Pro., 430.30, et seq.) In particular, as is relevant here, a court should sustain a demurrer if a complaint does not allege facts that are legally sufficient to constitute a cause of action. (See id. 430.10, subd. (e).) As the Supreme Court held in Blank v. Kirwan (1985) Cal.3d 311: “We treat the demurrer as admitting all material facts properly pleaded, but not contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law. . . . Further, we give the complaint a reasonable interpretation, reading it as a whole and its parts in their context.” (Id. at p. 318; see also Hahn. v. Mirda (2007) 147 Cal.App.4th 740, 747 [“A demurrer tests the pleadings alone and not the evidence or other extrinsic matters. Therefore, it lies only where the defects appear on the face of the pleading or are judicially noticed. [Citation.]”)

“In determining whether the complaint is sufficient as against the demurrer … if on consideration of all the facts stated it appears the plaintiff is entitled to any relief at the hands of the court against the defendants the complaint will be held good although the facts may not be clearly stated.” (Gressley v. Williams (1961) 193 Cal.App.2d 636, 639.)

A demurrer for uncertainty is strictly construed, even where a complaint is in some respects uncertain, because ambiguities can be clarified under modern discovery procedures.” (Khoury v. Maly’s of Cal., Inc. (1993) 14 Cal.App.4th 612, 616.) Such demurrers “are disfavored, and are granted only if the pleading is so incomprehensible that a defendant cannot reasonably respond.” (Mahan v. Charles W. Chan Insurance Agency, Inc. (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 841, 848.)

A demurrer should not be sustained without leave to amend if the complaint, liberally construed, can state a cause of action under any theory or if there is a reasonable possibility the defect can be cured by amendment. (Schifando v. City of Los Angeles, supra, 31 Cal.4th at p. 1081.) The demurrer also may be sustained without leave to amend where the nature of the defects and previous unsuccessful attempts to plead render it probable plaintiff cannot state a cause of action. (Krawitz v. Rusch (1989) 209 Cal.App.3d 957, 967.)

Defendant demurrers to the fourth cause of action for breach of employment contract on the grounds that no facts are pleaded to suggest what precise terms or obligations Defendant breached. (Demurrer at pp. 2–4.)

Defendant has simply failed to read the Complaint. The Complaint alleges that Plaintiff and Defendant orally agreed to a term of employment of at least one year, to be terminated only for good cause within that time, and that such for-cause agreement was corroborated in the writings attached as exhibits to the Complaint. (Complaint 44–50, Exh. B.) Although Defendant notes that at-will employment is presumed, Defendant neglects that the at-will rule applies only to employment contracts “having no specified term.” (Lab. Code 2922.) Plaintiff alleges that the parties specifically agreed to for-cause termination, at least within a one-year period. Defendant’s argument is without merit.

In reply, Defendant argues for the first time that the contract is barred by the statute of frauds, specifically that provision requiring agreements necessarily performed in excess of a year from execution to be memorialized in writing. (Reply at pp. 4–5, citing Newfield v. Insurance Co. of the West (1984) 156 Cal.App.3d 440, 446.)

This argument furnishes no basis to sustain the demurrer, however, both because it is offered only in reply, and thus without providing Plaintiff with an opportunity to rebut it, and also because it is wrong on the substance. For one, the agreement that Plaintiff alleges is memorialized in writings, attached to the Complaint and interpreted in Plaintiff’s allegations. (Complaint Exh. B.) What’s more, although Defendant cites the Newfield case, which indeed held long-term employment contracts to fall within the statute of frauds, Defendant also, perhaps inadvertently, cites the California Supreme Court case which explicitly overruled the Newfield decision and held long-term for-cause termination contracts to be outside the ambit of the statute of frauds. (Reply at p. 5, citing Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 673 [“Because the employee can quit or the employer can discharge for cause, even an agreement that strictly defines appropriate grounds for discharge can be completely performed within one year—or within one day for that matter.”].) The agreement described in the Complaint is thus concrete in the obligations described and not subject to the statute of frauds. Defendant’s demurrer is meritless and OVERRULED.