This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 16:33:15 (UTC).

JAY HWAN LEE, ET AL. VS EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 JAY HWAN LEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2080

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE JAY HWAN

LEE JUNG SUK

Defendants

CHOW WEN FENG

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE HAN S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/24/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2024
  • Hearing08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jay Hwan Lee (Plaintiff); Jung Suk Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jay Hwan Lee (Plaintiff); Jung Suk Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jay Hwan Lee (Plaintiff); Jung Suk Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE HAN S.