Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 07:36:32 (UTC).

JAX FULL, LLC VS MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 JAX FULL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9446

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAX FULL LLC DBA INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION LLC

Defendants

XLD GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MCGUIRE BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SCG AMERICA CONSTRUCTION INC DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BURROWS LEE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...) OF 06/08/2021

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...) OF 06/08/2021

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/4/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) of 06/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAX FULL, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JAX FULL, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAX FULL, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAX FULL, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCG AMERICA CONSTRUCTION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where XLD GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MCGUIRE BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURROWS LEE E. ESQ.