This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2022 at 08:58:34 (UTC).

JAVION SUN VS SUPPOSE U DRIVE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 JAVION SUN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUPPOSE U DRIVE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1172

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN JAVION

Defendants

SALAS JOSE

SUPPOSE U DRIVE INC.

M.L. WINTERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAKE BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

LAL AMAN ASHISH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

7/16/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2024
  • Hearing06/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Javion Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Salas (Defendant); MI Winters CO, LLC Erroneously Sued As M.L. Winters, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Javion Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Javion Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Javion Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Javion Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Javion Sun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPPOSE U DRIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAKE BENJAMIN