This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2021 at 03:00:04 (UTC).

JAVIER ZAMORA MARTINEZ VS MICHAEL H MCALISTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 JAVIER ZAMORA MARTINEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL H MCALISTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3287

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMORA MARTINEZ JAVIER AKA JZ TRUCKING

Defendants

DEUTSCH LARRY AN INDIVIDUAL

DEUTSCH JACOB AN INDIVIDUAL

MCALISTER MICHAEL H TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VARGAS BRENDA ELIZABETH

VARGAS BRENDA E.

BRIEN KERRY O'

O'BRIEN KERRY

Defendant Attorneys

IRMAS JARED MAXWELL

REICHENEDER DALE

SPEAR BRADLEY H.

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTI APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION

6/16/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTI APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal - MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL OF CASE AND FOR JUDGMENT/SETTLEMENT

6/16/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal - MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL OF CASE AND FOR JUDGMENT/SETTLEMENT

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

6/16/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTIO...)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTIO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTIO...) OF 06/17/2021, ORDER

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTIO...) OF 06/17/2021, ORDER

Order - ORDER SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

6/17/2021: Order - ORDER SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

Order - Dismissal

5/24/2021: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 05/24/2021

5/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 05/24/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

5/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

5/17/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

5/17/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL

5/17/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRENDA E. VARGAS

5/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRENDA E. VARGAS

Order - ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

5/18/2021: Order - ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL) OF 05/18/2021, ORDER RE: EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER JURY TRIAL

5/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL) OF 05/18/2021, ORDER RE: EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL)

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE) OF 05/19/2021

5/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE) OF 05/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • Hearing07/01/2021 at 11:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( to Shorten Time to Hear Motion) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time to Hear Motio...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOrder (Shorten Time for Motion to Set Aside Dismissal); Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time to Hear Motio...) of 06/17/2021, Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Shorten Time to Hear Motion); Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application to Shorten Time for Motion to Set Aside Dismissal of Case and for Judgment/Settlement; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Javier Zamora Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIEN KERRY O'

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARGAS BRENDA ELIZABETH