This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 15:00:01 (UTC).

JAVIER SANCHEZ VS BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 JAVIER SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOWMAN PLATING CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHANIE M. BOWICK and HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4897

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ JAVIER

Defendant

BOWMAN PLATING CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TSARUKYAN ANDRANIK

Defendant Attorney

SENKFOR BURTON MARK

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/2/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

11/2/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/2/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/2/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/03/2022

11/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/03/2022

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/3/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT CONTROVERSY IN LAWSUIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1/10/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT CONTROVERSY IN LAWSUIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/10/2023

1/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/10/2023

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Arbitration scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Entire Action/Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation to Submit Controversy in Lawsuit to Binding Arbitration; [Proposed] Order; Filed by: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC. (Defendant); As to: Javier Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 01/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketAddress for Andranik Tsarukyan (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation to BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Javier Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Javier Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 19 - Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less