This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 00:21:48 (UTC).

JAVIER QUIROGA NEGRETE ET AL VS JEFFREY JIN CHONG ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 JAVIER QUIROGA NEGRETE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFFREY JIN CHONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7199

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BRIGIDO JOSE

NEGRETE JAVIER QUIROGA

FIGUEROA JUAN

BRIGIDO QUIROGA JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

CHONG JEFFREY JIN

CHONG MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CALIFORNIA LAWYERS GROUP INC

Defendant Attorney

HERZOG MICHAEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIALS, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

5/24/2018: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIALS, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

Stipulation

10/24/2018: Stipulation

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/5/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Stipulation - No Order (Proposed Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC and all related motion/discovery dates); Filed by Jose Brigido Quiroga (Plaintiff); Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Jose Brigido Quiroga (Plaintiff); Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Jose Brigido Quiroga (Plaintiff); Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Brigido Quiroga (Plaintiff); Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Brigido Quiroga (Plaintiff); Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jose Brigido Quiroga (Plaintiff); Javier Quiroga Negrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC647199    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST; LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

On January 17, 2017, plaintiffs Javier Quiroga Negrete, Jose Brigido (“Plaintiff”) and Juan Figueroa filed this action against defendants Jeffery Jin Chong and Michael Chong for injuries and damages arising from a February 4, 2015 motor vehicle collision. The case settled, but Plaintiff passed away on July 13, 2018 and is unable to sign the settlement papers. Plaintiff’s wife, Maria Elena Ramos-Lopez (“Ramos-Lopez”) seeks to be substituted as Plaintiff’s successor-in-interest in the action and to file a Second Amended Complaint naming her as such. There is no opposition.

After the death of a plaintiff, the court, on motion, shall allow a pending action that does not abate to be continued by the decedent’s personal representative or successor-in-interest. (Code Civ. Proc., § 377.31.) The person who seeks to commence or continue a pending action as the decedent’s successor-in-interest shall execute and file an affidavit or declaration stating: (1) the decedent’s name, (2) the date and place of decedent’s death, (3) “No proceeding is now pending in California for administration of the decedent’s estate,” (4) a copy of the final order showing the distribution of the decedent’s cause of action to the successor-in-interest, if the decedent’s estate was administered, (5) either the affiant or declarant is the decedent’s successor in interest or the affiant or declarant is authorized to act on behalf of the decedent’s successor in interest, with facts in support thereof, (6) “No other person has a superior right to commence the action or proceeding or to be substituted for the decedent in the pending action or proceeding,” and (7) the statements are true, under penalty of perjury. (Code Civ. Proc., § 377.32.)

Ramos-Lopez submitted a declaration that complies with the requirements of section 377.32. Accordingly, the Motion to substitute a successor-in-interest is GRANTED and leave is granted to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint naming her Plaintiff’s successor-in-interest. Ramos-Lopez is to file the Second Amended Complaint within 10 days of the date of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.