This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2020 at 22:12:32 (UTC).

JAVIER GAONA VARGAS VS MICHELL EDWARD KING

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 JAVIER GAONA VARGAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHELL EDWARD KING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1455

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VARGAS JAVIER GAONA

Defendants and Respondents

KING MITCHELL EDWARD

DOES 1 TO 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HAYES BRAD G. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GATES O'DOHERTY GONTER & GUY LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

3/11/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF; DECLARATION OF JEREMY SNIDER

3/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF; DECLARATION OF JEREMY SNIDER

Motion to Continue Trial Date

2/10/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/5/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

6/8/2018: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/8/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/8/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS -

4/9/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/9/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Javier Gaona Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Mitchell Edward King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF PLAINTIFF?S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF; DECLARATION OF JEREMY SNIDER); Filed by Mitchell Edward King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Mitchell Edward King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Mitchell Edward King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mitchell Edward King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Mitchell Edward King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Javier Gaona Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Javier Gaona Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701455    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On April 9, 2018, plaintiff Javier Gaona Vargas (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Mitchell Edward King (“Defendant”) for injuries sustained in an April 21, 2016 motor vehicle accident. Trial is currently scheduled for April 6, 2020. Defendant moves to continue the trial date to August 24, 2020.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Defendant argues the parties need to complete discovery. Although Plaintiff was initially deposed on December 6, 2018, Plaintiff served supplemental discovery responses identifying new and recent medical treatment as well as future medical expenses. Plaintiff’s second deposition is scheduled for March 23, 2020. Plaintiff’s independent medical examination is also scheduled for May 5, 2020, which is after the current trial date. Two continuances have been granted before.

The Court finds good cause to continue the trial. Trial is continued to August 24, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27 at Spring Street Courthouse. The Final Status Conference is continued to August 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 27 at Spring Street Courthouse. All discovery and motion cut-off dates to be based on the new trial date. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses and experts of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected by the moving party, without opposition. The Court presumes the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel, witnesses and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel, witnesses, and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.