This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 11:59:03 (UTC).

JAVIER FARFAN VS WALMART, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 JAVIER FARFAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WALMART, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8330

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARFAN JAVIER

Defendant

WALMART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALIZADEH ARASH

Defendant Attorney

NAGEOTTE KYLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/25/2019

9/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/25/2019

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

5/29/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

Notice on Hearing About Court Fees - NOTICE ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES FW HEARING SET FOR 07/09/2019

6/19/2019: Notice on Hearing About Court Fees - NOTICE ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES FW HEARING SET FOR 07/09/2019

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/9/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

7/9/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

Proof of Service by Mail

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/13/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/13/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

8/13/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/3/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/24/2019: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 09/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Fee Waiver Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) (DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Javier Farfan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNotice on Hearing About Court Fees (FW HEARING SET FOR 07/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (DENIED); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Javier Farfan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Javier Farfan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Javier Farfan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nageotte, Kyle W