This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 05:07:05 (UTC).

JAVIER CRUZ VILLAVICENCIO VS BILLION AUTO GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 JAVIER CRUZ VILLAVICENCIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BILLION AUTO GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0641

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAVICENCIO JAVIER CRUZ

Defendants

5 STAR AUTO GROUP

ALLY FINANCIAL

BILLION AUTO GROUP

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS BEN

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/30/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Javier Cruz Villavicencio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Javier Cruz Villavicencio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Javier Cruz Villavicencio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5 STAR AUTO GROUP A CORPORATION DBA BILLION AUTO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant