This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 17:13:58 (UTC).

JAVIER, ALVANEZ ALEXANDER VS MENDEZ, DANUBIA DEL CARMEN

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 JAVIER, ALVANEZ ALEXANDER filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against MENDEZ, DANUBIA DEL CARMEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1179

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAVIER ALVANEZ ALEXANDER

Respondent

MENDEZ DANUBIA DEL CARMEN

Not Classified By Court

LACEY JACKIE - District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/16/2017

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2017

DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2017

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2017

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2017

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017

DocketMiscellaneous (Proposed Stipulations ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2017

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2017

DocketNotice; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2017

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2017

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2017

DocketMiscellaneous (PETITION FOR A WARRANT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less