This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2023 at 06:24:53 (UTC).

JAVAGUS M. GAYDEN VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 JAVAGUS M GAYDEN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7033

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAYDEN JAVAGUS M.

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASHANI JACOB KAHEN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

12/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/29/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Corporation (Defendant); As to: JAVAGUS M. GAYDEN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service Amended; Filed by: JAVAGUS M. GAYDEN (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JAVAGUS M. GAYDEN (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JAVAGUS M. GAYDEN (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JAVAGUS M. GAYDEN (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JAVAGUS M. GAYDEN (Plaintiff); As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 39 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASHANI JACOB KAHEN