This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 04:21:09 (UTC).

JASON SMITH VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 JASON SMITH filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3967

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH JASON

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/23/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/23/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/23/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/28/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • Hearing08/22/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jason Smith (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/24/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/22/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- General Motors, LLC. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. to General Motors, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Adam M. Zolonz, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Esq. to Zolonz; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name changed from Zolonz to M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAddress for Adam M. Zolonz, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jason Smith (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jason Smith (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jason Smith (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less