This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 22:31:11 (UTC).

JASON SEWER VS SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 JASON SEWER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC , AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1205

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEWER JASON

Defendants

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

SYLVESTER JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/11/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/18/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/18/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jason Sewer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jason Sewer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jason Sewer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Sewer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Sewer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERMAN RICHARD