This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2022 at 10:35:12 (UTC).

JASON RYAN FISHMAN VS AMALIE ORME

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 JASON RYAN FISHMAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMALIE ORME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1019

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FISHMAN JASON RYAN

Defendant

ORME AMALIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHOZLAND MICHAEL F.

Defendant Attorney

SULLIVAN PAUL F.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/1/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/1/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/1/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/1/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

5/11/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/11/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

10/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/28/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JASON RYAN FISHMAN on 04/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by JASON RYAN FISHMAN as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: JASON RYAN FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: AMALIE ORME (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JASON RYAN FISHMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMALIE ORME (Defendant); As to: JASON RYAN FISHMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: AMALIE ORME (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JASON RYAN FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: AMALIE ORME (Defendant); Service Date: 04/11/2022; Service Cost: 112.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JASON RYAN FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: AMALIE ORME (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/28/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JASON RYAN FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: AMALIE ORME (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JASON RYAN FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: AMALIE ORME (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN PAUL F.