This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2019 at 01:14:40 (UTC).

JASON ROSENBAUM VS MUFG UNION BANK NA

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by JASON ROSENBAUM against MUFG UNION BANK NA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8763

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ROSENBAUM JASON

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

MUFG UNION BANK NA

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

7/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

7/25/2018: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Substitution of Attorney

6/4/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

6/26/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order

6/26/2019: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/27/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/18/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/18/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/29/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/7/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

3/20/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR 1. RETALIATION ;ETC

3/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR 1. RETALIATION ;ETC

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Notice ( of Case Reassignment); Filed by Jason Rosenbaum (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • at 3:04 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by MUFG Union Bank NA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice; Filed by MUFG Union Bank NA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by MUFG Union Bank NA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Answer; Filed by MUFG Union Bank NA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jason Rosenbaum (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jason Rosenbaum (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR 1. RETALIATION ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698763    Hearing Date: March 17, 2020    Dept: 76

THE COURT WAIVES THE REQUIREMENTS GOVERNING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ON EX PARTE APPLICATIONS UNDER CRC 3.670(d) AND THE REQUIREMENT OF ADVANCE NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE UNDER CRC 3.670(h).  THE COURT ENCOURAGES COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY.

The Court has reviewed the ex parte application and stipulation of the parties, and is inclined to continue the trial and to set a new hearing date for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.   However, the Court's trial calendar does not appear to accommodate the trial date requested by counsel.  The parties should appear for this ex parte application to discuss alternative dates.