Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 11:16:18 (UTC).

JASON ROFEH VS WEBINTERPRET, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 JASON ROFEH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEBINTERPRET, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1315

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROFEH JASON DBA GALLERY XV

Defendant

WEBINTERPRET INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENSKY ARTHUR L.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

8/21/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

9/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Extending Time To Respond to Complaint); Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENSKY ARTHUR