This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 16:20:59 (UTC).

JASON ROFEH VS LENNOX JEWELRY AND LOAN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 JASON ROFEH filed an Other lawsuit against LENNOX JEWELRY AND LOAN, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9339

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROFEH JASON DBA GALLARY XV DBA GALLARY XV

Defendants

PAWN N CASH INC. DBA LATINO PAWN

LENNOX JEWELRY AND LOAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENSKY ARTHUR L.

Defendant Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA F

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMANDS FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

9/23/2021: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMANDS FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

9/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Separate Statement

8/25/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

8/25/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMANDS FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUM

8/31/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMANDS FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUM

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FILED BY PLAINTIFF RE: ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

9/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FILED BY PLAINTIFF RE: ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HE...)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HE...)

Separate Statement

9/8/2021: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

9/8/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

7/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference

6/28/2021: Informal Discovery Conference

Case Management Statement

4/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

1/29/2021: Answer

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Hearing11/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketReply (TO DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMANDS FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE); Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY); Filed by Pawn N Cash, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Pawn N Cash, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order Advancing the Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Demands for Inspection and Production of Documents) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lennox Jewelry and Loan, Inc. (Defendant); Pawn N Cash, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Rofeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STCV49339 Hearing Date: September 30, 2021 Dept: 74

\r\n\r\n

20STCV49339 JASON\r\nROFEH vs LENNOX JEWELRY AND LOAN, INC

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Further Reponses to\r\nDiscovery

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion to compel responses to discovery\r\nis GRANTED IN PART.

\r\n\r\n

Defendants Lennox Jewelry and Loan, Inc. and Pawn N Cash,\r\nInc. are ordered to produce all documents responsive to demands 1, 2, 3, and 4 within\r\n15 days. As defendants’ responses to demands\r\n9-12 are code compliant and there was no representation of an intention to\r\nproduce any documents, plaintiff’s motion concerning these\r\ndemands is denied.

\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENSKY ARTHUR