This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 04:15:01 (UTC).

JASON ROBERT VAUGHN VS JOHN IKIRT COVERT

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 JASON ROBERT VAUGHN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN IKIRT COVERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5872

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VAUGHN JASON ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

COVERT JOHN IKIRT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

O'CONNOR R. TIMOTHY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SHAVER THOMAS WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

2/24/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

2/13/2020: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIALL, FSC, AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES

2/13/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIALL, FSC, AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND FOR COSTS INCLUDING REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND FOR COSTS INCLUDING REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, MOTION TO COMPEL DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AN

1/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, MOTION TO COMPEL DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAI...)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAI...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/23/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

8/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

8/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/11/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/11/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING RE: JOHN

3/19/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING RE: JOHN

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/25/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/12/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

SUMMONS -

2/28/2018: SUMMONS -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Hearing04/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Hearing03/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Hearing03/18/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by John Ikirt Covert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial, FSC and all trial related cut-off dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial, FSC and al...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by John Ikirt Covert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by R. Timothy O'Connor, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by R. Timothy O'Connor, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Jason Robert Vaughn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by John Ikirt Covert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John Ikirt Covert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (re: John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Jason Robert Vaughn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Robert Vaughn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENT OPERATION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE/PERSONAL INJURY

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695872    Hearing Date: March 18, 2020    Dept: 27

ORDER RE CONTINUANCE

Due to governmental declarations of a state of emergency, the hearing on the motion for terminating sanctions is continued to April 17, 2020 at 1:30 pm. The Final Status Conference date of March 25, 2020 and the trial date of April 8, 2020 are vacated. A trial setting conference is set for May 15, 2020 at 8:30 am. Moving party is to give notice.

Case Number: BC695872    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND DISCOVERY RESPONSES

On February 28, 2018, plaintiff Jason Robert Vaughn filed this action against defendant John Ikirt Covert relating to a March 4, 2016 two-car accident. On July 11, 2019, Plaintiff’s then-counsel filed a motion to be relieved. The motion to be relieved was granted on August 23, 2019.

On April 29, 2019, Defendant served a demand for production of documents, form interrogatories, and special interrogatories. Defendant gave two extensions of the time to respond. On September 26, 2019, defense counsel sent a letter to Plaintiff asking about the responses. Plaintiff did not respond. Defendant moves to compel the responses.

On July 3, 2019, Defendant served a notice of deposition on Plaintiff, scheduling the deposition for August 20, 2019. The deposition did not take place that day. On October 3, 2019, Defendant served a new notice of deposition for November 7, 2019. Plaintiff did not appear at his re-noticed deposition. Defendant requests an order compelling Plaintiff’s attendance at deposition within 20 days of this Order at defense counsel’s office.

Plaintiff did not oppose these motions.

Any party may obtain discovery, subject to restrictions, by taking the oral deposition of any person, including any party to the action. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.010.) A properly served deposition notice is effective to require a party or party-affiliated deponent to attend and to testify, as well as to produce documents for inspection and copying. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.280, subd. (a).) “If, after service of a deposition notice, a party . . . without having served a valid objection . . . fails to appear for examination, or to proceed with it, or to produce for inspection any document . . . described in the deposition notice, the party giving notice may move for an order compelling deponent’s attendance and testimony, and the production . . . of any document . . . described in the deposition notice.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.450, subd. (a).)

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).)

Plaintiff filed no opposition to these motions, did not appear at the noticed deposition, and did not serve responses to Defendant’s requests for discovery. Accordingly, the motions to compel are GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objection, to Defendant’s Special Interrogatories (Set One), Form Interrogatories (Set One) and Demand for Production (Set One) within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is ordered to appear for deposition at defense counsel’s office within twenty (20) day of the date of this Order.

Defendant requests sanctions. However, Defendant only filed two motions and paid two filing fees, instead of filing one motion for the demand for production of documents, one motion for the special interrogatories, and one motion for the form interrogatories. Defendant’s request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED on the condition that Defendant submit proof of payment of the third filing fee. Subject to such proof, sanctions are imposed against Plaintiff in the amount of $885 to be paid within twenty (20) days of the date of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.