This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 00:56:08 (UTC).

JASON LEE ET AL VS SCUBA MANIA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 JASON LEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SCUBA MANIA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and PATRICK T. MADDEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1786

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

PATRICK T. MADDEN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

LEE JASON

LEE NANCY

YI ESTATE OF CATHERINE DECEASED

NANCY LEE

ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI DECEASED

JASON LEE

Defendants and Respondents

FALZONE ANTHONY

SMITH RANDY

DOES 1 TO 100

CATALINA DIVERS SUPPLY

MOSS JOHN

SCUBA MANIA INC

BEACH CITIES SCUBA

GRUNDY JAMES

JOHN MOSS

JAMES GRUNDY

RANDY SMITH

DOES 1-100

ANTHONY FALZONE

Other

RYU LAW FIRM (FRANCIS RYU)

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LESSER RICHARD A.

LESSER & ASSOCIATES PLC (RICHARD LESSER)

SABA RYAN

LESSER & ASSOCIATES PLC RICHARD LESSER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES

COX WOOTTON LERNER GRIFFIN & HANSEN LLP

LERNER NEIL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order

9/11/2018: Stipulation - No Order

Summons

1/16/2019: Summons

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/16/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice

1/22/2019: Notice

Substitution of Attorney

7/3/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/3/2019: Substitution of Attorney

DEFENDANTS ANTHONY FAI1ONE AND RANDY SMITH?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/21/2018: DEFENDANTS ANTHONY FAI1ONE AND RANDY SMITH?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

MEMORAN1UM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ANTHONY FALZONE AND RANDY SMITH?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/21/2018: MEMORAN1UM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ANTHONY FALZONE AND RANDY SMITH?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF NEIL S. LERNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ANTHONY FALZONE AN1) RANDY SMITH?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/21/2018: DECLARATION OF NEIL S. LERNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ANTHONY FALZONE AN1) RANDY SMITH?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

3/23/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

DEFENDANT C & LINS INC. S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/23/2018: DEFENDANT C & LINS INC. S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

3/27/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

2/28/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SUPPORTING DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SUPPORTING DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS

Notice of Related Cases

3/12/2018: Notice of Related Cases

APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS SCUBA MAMA, INC. DBA BEACH CITIES SCUBA, JAMES GRUNDY AND JOHN MOSS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/12/2018: APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS SCUBA MAMA, INC. DBA BEACH CITIES SCUBA, JAMES GRUNDY AND JOHN MOSS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Nancy Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by JASON LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Proof of Service of Second Amended Complaint); Filed by ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI, DECEASED (Plaintiff); JASON LEE (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Amended Complaint; Filed by ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI, DECEASED (Plaintiff); ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI, DECEASED (Plaintiff); Yi, Estate of Catherine, deceased (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI, DECEASED (Plaintiff); JASON LEE (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI, DECEASED (Plaintiff); JASON LEE (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Stipulation PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Cases consolidated for all Purpose) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin & Hansen, LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Nancy Lee (Plaintiff); Yi, Estate of Catherine, deceased (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Nancy Lee (Plaintiff); Yi, Estate of Catherine, deceased (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI, DECEASED (Plaintiff); JASON LEE (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL DAMAGES UNDER GENERAL MARITIME LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by ESTATE OF CATERHINE YI, DECEASED (Plaintiff); JASON LEE (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATALINA DIVERS SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where SCUBA MANIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RYU LAW FIRM APC is a litigant