This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 19:12:24 (UTC).

JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MED-AESTHETIC SOLUTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 JASON J EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MED-AESTHETIC SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0438

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASON J. EMER MD PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

MED-AESTHETIC SOLUTIONS INC. DBA SALTMED INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCCOLLOCH MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

SEGAL LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/2/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Request for Judicial Notice

9/2/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Separate Statement

9/2/2021: Separate Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

6/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF SETTING DATES AND OBLIGATIONS FOR TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND RELATED MATTERS

6/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SETTING DATES AND OBLIGATIONS FOR TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND RELATED MATTERS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/26/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

5/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/17/2021: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department STL-E at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; MSC Timeslot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Setting Dates and Obligations for Trial, Final Status Conference, and Related Matters); Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations); Filed by MED-AESTHETIC SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MED-AESTHETIC SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JASON J. EMER, MD, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JASON J. EMER MD PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEGAL LAWRENCE