Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 05:16:32 (UTC).

JASON IERIEN VS THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 JASON IERIEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4972

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IERIEN JASON

Defendant

THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POTTER MARK DEE

TREGLIO JAMES MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY BARRY ALAN

WELLERSTEIN JAIMEE KARA

PARK DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

Answer - DEFENDANT, THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF, JASON HERIEN'S COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT, THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF, JASON HERIEN'S COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/15/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

4/16/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

4/2/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Related Case

3/22/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Appearance

2/23/2021: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

2/3/2021: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

1/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

1/5/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/23/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant, The World Protection Group, INC.'s Answer to Plaintiff, Jason Herien's complaint; Filed by The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Service; Filed by Jason Ierien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (on Initial Status Conference); Filed by The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Jason Ierien (Plaintiff); The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Initial Status conference statement; Filed by Jason Ierien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Ierien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:51 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/05/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Ierien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Ierien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POTTER MARK DEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TREGLIO, JAMES M