This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 03:07:29 (UTC).

JASON HARRIS VS JACOBS ENGINEERING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 JASON HARRIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JACOBS ENGINEERING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1241

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS JASON

Defendants

JACOBS ENGINEERING INC.

MAGIN MARK

JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAYLOR MICHAEL STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

DARROW TANJA LAVONNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/13/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

5/12/2022: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/12/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2022

4/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

2/18/2022: Answer - ANSWER JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/1/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Complaint

1/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Status Conference (ReRemoval to Federal Court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jason Harris (Plaintiff); JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC. Erroneously Sued As Jacobs Engineering, Inc. (Defendant); Mark Magin (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docketat 07:24 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Jacobs Telecommunications, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jason Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer (JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.?S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT); Filed by JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC. Erroneously Sued As Jacobs Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC. Erroneously Sued As Jacobs Engineering, Inc. (Defendant); Mark Magin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jason Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacobs Telecommunications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JACOBS ENGINEERING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARROW TANJA LAVONNE