This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 21:35:44 (UTC).

JASON GRENDUS VS YACOV COHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 JASON GRENDUS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YACOV COHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2969

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

GRENDUS JASON

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

KACHONE ARIE

COHEN YACOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

ABB WAYNE MARK

NUSSBAUM LANE MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

ISAACS BARAK

ERLICH RINAT B

ERLICH RINAT KLIER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

6/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER AND CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/25/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER AND CROSS-COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

5/26/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Substitution of Attorney

5/14/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) AMENDED

5/14/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) AMENDED

Cross-Complaint

4/30/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

4/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

5/6/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/6/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/12/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Hearing05/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Hearing10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment; Filed by Arie Kachone (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Motion to Strike Answer and Cross-Complaint); Filed by Jason Grendus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder (Re: Motion to Strike); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by Jason Grendus (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Jason Grendus (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Grendus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jason Grendus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yacov Cohen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Jason Grendus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Grendus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Grendus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jason Grendus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERLICH RINAT KLIER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIER-ERLICH RINAT