This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2021 at 04:54:31 (UTC).

JASON FRANKLIN JOEL VS CHANDOS MAHON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 JASON FRANKLIN JOEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHANDOS MAHON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8137

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOEL JASON FRANKLIN

Defendants

S&R INCOME FUND I LP

LAND VICTORIA

MARQUEE FUNDING GROUP

MAHON CHANDOS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/5/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jason Franklin Joel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jason Franklin Joel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Franklin Joel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Franklin Joel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S & R INCOME FUND I, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where MARQUEE FUNDING GROUP INC is a litigant