This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 01:47:56 (UTC).

JASON ERIC STRAUSS VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 JASON ERIC STRAUSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6990

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRAUSS JASON ERIC

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENT ENTITY ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC.

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTHWEST INC.

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS ONLINE AND LONG-DISTANCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRENCH JESSE EDWARD

MCCANN SHAWN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

SIMMEN TIM

MCFARLANE PAMELA L.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/28/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/27/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

2/27/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/27/2023: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/15/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/8/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/31/2023: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/25/2023: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Informal Discovery Conference

1/18/2023: Informal Discovery Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

12/15/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/11/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2025
  • Hearing02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frontier California, Inc. (Defendant); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity acting by and through the Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: Frontier California, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity acting by and through the Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Frontier California, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jason Eric Strauss (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Frontier California, Inc. (Defendant); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity acting by and through the Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 11:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jason Eric Strauss (Plaintiff); As to: Frontier California, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/13/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jason Eric Strauss (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity acting by and through the Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jason Eric Strauss (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity acting by and through the Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jason Eric Strauss (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity acting by and through the Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less