This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:41:31 (UTC).

JASON EMER VS CHRISTINE KLEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 JASON EMER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CHRISTINE KLEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4539

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMER JASON

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ARROYO GUSTAVO

ATEN ENTERPRISES A BUSINESS ASSOCIATION FORM UNKNOWN

CKLEIN PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

KLEIN CHRISTINE

TATUM ZANE

Cross Defendant

THE LIVING CANVAS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEGAL LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorney

PLUMTREE A. MARIA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Ruling

1/20/2022: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

1/11/2022: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/3/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Cross-Complaint

12/15/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

12/15/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/27/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketResponse (Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause re: Failure to File Proof of Service); Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Gustavo Arroyo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jason Emer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEGAL LAWRENCE