This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 08:35:33 (UTC).

JASON BROWN ET AL VS ASHLEY MARIE SMITH ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2017 JASON BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASHLEY MARIE SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, MARC D. GROSS and MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5439

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MARC D. GROSS

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SCHNAKENBERG MICHELLE LEE

BROWN JASON

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DOES 1 TO 20

SMITH ASHLEY MARIE

SMITH NATHAN

SMITH - GOOD FAITH NATHAN

SMITH - GOOD FAITH ASHLEY MARIE

Cross Plaintiff

CITY OF CULVER CITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JOSSEN SANFORD ESQ

LAW OFFICES OF SANFORD JOSSEN

JOSSEN SANFORD

KRAMER RANDALL BRIAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MACKEY ROBERT T. ESQ.

PORTER CLARA L. ESQ.

LEMIEUX JAMES PHILIP

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCUNE & HARBER LLP

HU JENNIFER

HU JENNIFER G.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

7/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

Case Management Statement

1/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANT CITY OF CULVER CITY TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION OF PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED OF DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY, NOTICED FOR OCTOBER 15, 2019

12/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANT CITY OF CULVER CITY TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION OF PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED OF DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY, NOTICED FOR OCTOBER 15, 2019

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

10/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/19/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO CULVER CITYS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/28/2019: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO CULVER CITYS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Separate Statement

8/28/2019: Separate Statement

Response - RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

8/29/2019: Response - RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Request for Dismissal

6/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion for Summary Adjudication

2/14/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS OR DISPUTED ANSWERS RE: SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES RE: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (NOS. 1-54) [SET ONE] PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT NATHAN SMITH

9/11/2018: PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS OR DISPUTED ANSWERS RE: SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES RE: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (NOS. 1-54) [SET ONE] PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT NATHAN SMITH

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS OR DISPUTED ANSWERS RE: REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT NATHAN SMITH

9/11/2018: PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS OR DISPUTED ANSWERS RE: REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT NATHAN SMITH

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S VACATION

6/29/2018: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S VACATION

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/31/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • Hearing12/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Hearing11/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (( NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION(S) OF PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AT DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (( NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION(S) OF PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AT DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (( NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION(S) OF PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AT DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (( NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION(S) OF PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AT DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (( NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION(S) OF PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AT DEFENDANT, CULVER CITY)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Motions for Order to Compel the Deposition of Person(s) Most Qualified of Defendant, Culver City, and Order); Filed by JASON BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by JASON BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by JASON BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ASHLEY MARIE SMITH - GOOD FAITH (Defendant); NATHAN SMITH - GOOD FAITH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JASON BROWN (Plaintiff); MICHELLE LEE SCHNAKENBERG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC685439    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles – Central District

JASON BROWN, et al. ,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

ASHLEY MARIE SMITH, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC685439

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 5 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE WEST DISTRICT, JUDGE MARC GROSS presiding in DEPT. R of the SANTA MONICA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the case for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

PlaintiffS shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: December 12, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court