This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 01:32:29 (UTC).

JASMINE WINTER VS ALFREDO ZALAYA

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 JASMINE WINTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALFREDO ZALAYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6315

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINTER JASMINE

Defendant

ZALAYA ALFREDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINTERS JONATHAN D

Defendant Attorney

BROWN SAMUEL ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

7/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

7/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

5/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

5/18/2021: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

5/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

5/6/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

5/6/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/30/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

4/30/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2024
  • Hearing04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alfredo Zalaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alfredo Zalaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jasmine WINTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jasmine WINTER (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jane Doe); Filed by Jasmine WINTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jane Doe); Filed by Jasmine WINTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jasmine WINTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jasmine WINTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jasmine WINTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTERS JONATHAN D. ESQ.