This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2022 at 14:19:05 (UTC).

JASMINE NUNO VS ANGELA ARMAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 JASMINE NUNO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANGELA ARMAS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0890

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUNO JASMINE

Defendants

ARMAS ANGELA

ARMAS VALERIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALIN GARRY S

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/14/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • Hearing05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jasmine Nuno (Plaintiff); As to: Valerie Armas (Defendant); Service Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 39.98; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jasmine Nuno (Plaintiff); As to: Angela Armas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jasmine Nuno (Plaintiff); As to: Angela Armas (Defendant); Valerie Armas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jasmine Nuno (Plaintiff); As to: Angela Armas (Defendant); Valerie Armas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jasmine Nuno (Plaintiff); As to: Angela Armas (Defendant); Valerie Armas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less