This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 22:13:27 (UTC).

JASMINE NGUYEN VS RICHARD CHHOR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 JASMINE NGUYEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICHARD CHHOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1765

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN JASMINE

Defendants

VU THERESA

PHAN HENG

CHHOR RICHARD

PHAN BILLY

TA TONY AKA TUONG DUC TA

HUANG CATHERINE

NGUYEN PETER TRI

GOLD ELLEN K

VO LINDA LOI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NONG JULIE

NONG JULIE N. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BURTON STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

1/21/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

1/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

1/6/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/23/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/23/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

12/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/20/2020: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Hearing04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Hearing04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Tony Ta (Defendant); Heng Phan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tony Ta (Defendant); Heng Phan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Peter Tri Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Peter Tri Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jasmine Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less